MI HB4084 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-06 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education; teachers; reading disability diagnostics course requirement for professional certification; eliminate. Amends sec. 1531 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531).
Title
Education; teachers; reading disability diagnostics course requirement for professional certification; eliminate. Amends sec. 1531 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1531).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2018-03-13 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-13 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 155 Yeas 102 Nays 7 |
2018-03-13 | House | Amended |
2018-03-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-08 | House | Substitute H-5 Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2017-01-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/25/2017 |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred To Committee On Education Reform |
2017-01-25 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Tedder |