MI HB4084 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 89'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Assigned Pa 89'13 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; other; ALS of Michigan ("Lou Gehrig's disease") fund act; create. Creates new act.
Title
Individual income tax; other; ALS of Michigan ("Lou Gehrig's disease") fund act; create. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Assigned Pa 89'13 With Immediate Effect |
2013-07-03 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2013 @ 3:51 Pm |
2013-07-03 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/28/2013 @ 10:06 Am |
2013-06-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/17/2013 @ 1:37 Pm |
2013-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 250 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2013-04-10 | House | Transmitted |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2013-04-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2013-01-23 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2013 |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2013-01-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Farrington |