MI HB4067 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 524'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; physicians; licensing process; modify to incorporate interstate medical licensure compact. Amends secs. 17001 & 17501 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17001 & 333.17501) & adds secs. 17011a & 17511a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; physicians; licensing process; modify to incorporate interstate medical licensure compact. Amends secs. 17001 & 17501 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17001 & 333.17501) & adds secs. 17011a & 17511a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 883 (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 796 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 524'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:58 Pm
2018-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 4:21 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda
2018-12-28HousePresented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 6:42 Pm
2018-12-19HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-12-19HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-12-19House Roll Call # 883 Yeas 102 Nays 7
2018-12-19HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-12-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2018-12-13SenateInserted Full Title
2018-12-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 796 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-12-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-12-12SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-12-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-12-12SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-12-12SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-12-12SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-10-12SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-10-10HouseTransmitted
2017-10-10HouseTitle Amended
2017-10-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 Yeas 100 Nays 6
2017-10-10HouseRead A Third Time
2017-10-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-10-05HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2017-10-05HouseRead A Second Time
2017-09-27HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-09-27HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-01-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 01/24/2017
2017-01-24HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2017-01-24HouseRead A First Time
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Tedder

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4067
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4067.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4067.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4067.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4067.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0524.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-09-27-070.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-10-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-12-078.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-12-13-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-12-19-082.htm

Bill Comments

feedback