MI HB4039 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021; provide for. Create appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; supplemental appropriations for fiscal year 2020-2021; provide for. Create appropriation act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2021-02-03 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/27/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Joe Tate |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4039 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4039.htm |