MI HB4026 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-21 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fire; other; fees for fire inspection services; allow. Amends sec. 2c of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.2c).
Title
Fire; other; fees for fire inspection services; allow. Amends sec. 2c of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.2c).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-21 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-04-02 | Transmitted | |
2009-04-02 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 142 Yeas 91 Nays 19 | |
2009-04-02 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-03-18 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s) | |
2009-01-27 | Printed Bill Filed 01/23/2009 | |
2009-01-22 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2009-01-22 | Read A First Time | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced By Representative Richard Hammel |