MI HB4001 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 563'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 563'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; public records; statewide standards for freedom of information act costs; modify. Amends secs. 4, 5 & 10 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.234 et seq.).
Title
Civil rights; public records; statewide standards for freedom of information act costs; modify. Amends secs. 4, 5 & 10 of 1976 PA 442 (MCL 15.234 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 810 (Y: 101 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 935 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 935 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 (Y: 102 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 563'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/15/2015 @ 2:56 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/11/2015 @ 10:32 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/8/2015 @ 11:24 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 810 Yeas 101 Nays 9 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | House | Rule Suspended |
2014-12-19 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-12-19 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 935 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Withdrawn |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Postponed Temporarily |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Offered |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Transmitted |
2014-03-20 | House | Title Amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 147 Yeas 102 Nays 8 |
2014-03-20 | House | Amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted And Amended |
2014-03-19 | House | Substitute H-4 Not Adopted |
2014-03-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2013-11-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2013-11-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 |
2013-01-22 | House | Printed Bill Filed 01/10/2013 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2013-01-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Shirkey |