ME SP0981 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION DESIGNATING MARCH 10, 2024 TO MARCH 16, 2024 AS AMERICORPS WEEK IN MAINE
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION DESIGNATING MARCH 10, 2024 TO MARCH 16, 2024 AS AMERICORPS WEEK IN MAINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-13 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator NANGLE of Cumberland READ and ADOPTED. |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=SP0981&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0981&item=1&snum=131 |