ME LD974 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise the Laws on Tournament Games
Title
An Act To Revise the Laws on Tournament Games
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-17 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAULIEU of Auburn, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-12 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) in concurrence | |
2011-05-12 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-179) | |
2011-05-10 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-08 | (S) On motion by Senator Farnham of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |