ME LD963 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on January 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on January 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand Access to Early Postsecondary Education
Title
An Act To Expand Access to Early Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] |
Rep. Peter Johnson [R] | Rep. Karen Kusiak [D] | Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] |
Rep. Sharon Treat [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #463 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-01-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 463V 88 having voted in the affirmative and 54 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-01-14 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-07-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-328) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) AS AMENDED BY thereto Senate Amendment "A" (S-328) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-328) thereto READ and ADOPTED thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-328) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc taken from the Special Study Table |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator moved to to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc taken from the Special Study Table |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-545), in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-545) |
2013-06-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-14 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-14 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-03-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-03-12 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |