ME LD930 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Attract Young Families to Maine and Keep Young Families in Maine by Expanding the Child Care Tax Credit
Title
An Act To Attract Young Families to Maine and Keep Young Families in Maine by Expanding the Child Care Tax Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Christopher Johnson [D] |
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-05-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-07 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-06 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending the motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-06 | House | Representative GOODE of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2015-05-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-03-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION |
2015-03-17 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=930&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0321&item=1&snum=127 |