ME LD922 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Requirement That an Address Be Provided in Disclaimers on Political Radio Advertisements
Title
An Act Regarding the Requirement That an Address Be Provided in Disclaimers on Political Radio Advertisements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-403), in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) |
2013-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |