ME LD919 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the Summer Success Program Fund
Title
An Act To Establish the Summer Success Program Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #451 (Y: 73 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #133 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #133 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 451V 73 having voted in the affirmative and 64 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-113) in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-113) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 133 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-113). |
2017-05-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-113) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-11 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |