ME LD916 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Investment in Maine's Communications Network and Natural Gas Network
Title
An Act To Promote Investment in Maine's Communications Network and Natural Gas Network
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION, in concurrence. |
2013-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=916&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0640&item=1&snum=126 |