ME LD912 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Extend Family Medical Leave to Hourly School Employees
Title
An Act To Extend Family Medical Leave to Hourly School Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Roeder [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Scott Cuddy [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #446 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #363 (Y: 81 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #363 (Y: 81 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-723) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-723) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 446 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-723). |
2021-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-723) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 363 (Yeas 81 - Nays 55 - Absent 15 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |