ME LD90 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Ensure Appropriate Personal Needs Allowances for Persons Residing in Long-term Care Facilities
Title
Resolve, To Ensure Appropriate Personal Needs Allowances for Persons Residing in Long-term Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Stuckey [D] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] |
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Beth Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #26 (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-65), in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-65). |
2015-04-23 | House | READ the Second Time. |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2015-04-16 | House | TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-65) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-04-16 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2015-04-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 26 (Yeas 97 - Nays 49 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-01-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-20 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-01-20 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |