ME LD853 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate Weekend Malt Liquor Purchases by Licensed Establishments
Title
An Act To Facilitate Weekend Malt Liquor Purchases by Licensed Establishments
Sponsors
Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. Josanne Dolloff [R] | Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Sen. Lisa Keim [R] |
Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Scott Strom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-161), in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-161) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-161). |
2019-04-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |