ME LD847 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Divert Young Adults from the Adult Criminal Justice System
Title
An Act To Divert Young Adults from the Adult Criminal Justice System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #395 (Y: 70 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #323 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #239 (Y: 79 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #323 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #239 (Y: 79 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-30 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 395V 70 having voted in the affirmative and 71 in the negative, with 10 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2021-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2021-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-551) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-551) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 323 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-551). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-551) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 239 (Yeas 79 - Nays 54 - Absent 18 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |