ME LD840 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-20 - Voted: REFERRED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prevent Power Line Electrocutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prevent Power Line Electrocutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-20JointVoted: REFERRED
2021-10-20JointWork Session Held
2021-07-19HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Approved
2021-06-08JointCarry Over Requested
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2021-03-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback