ME LD822 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Allow All Corporations to Self-insure Motor Vehicles
Title
An Act to Allow All Corporations to Self-insure Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Foster [R] | Rep. Amanda Collamore [R] | Sen. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Gary Drinkwater [R] |
Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. Richard Mason [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] | Rep. Robert Nutting [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Bailey of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2023-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | On motion of Representative WILLIAMS of Bar Harbor, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed. |