ME LD816 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Promote Academic Achievement through Hunger Relief for Maine Children

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Promote Academic Achievement through Hunger Relief for Maine Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #200 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-13SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2018-05-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
2017-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-05HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-01HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-01HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-150).
2017-06-01HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-01HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-150) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-01HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-01HouseOn motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-01HouseReports READ.
2017-05-31SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-05-31SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-150)
2017-05-31SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-150) READ and ADOPTED
2017-05-31SenateREAD ONCE
2017-05-31SenateRoll Call Number 200 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2017-05-31SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2017-05-31SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-05-31SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, Roll Call Ordered
2017-05-31SenateSenator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2017-05-31SenateReports READ
2017-03-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-03-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-03-02SenateREFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
2017-03-02SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback