ME LD799 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Procedures for Veterinarians in the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Title
An Act To Amend the Procedures for Veterinarians in the Controlled Substances Prescription Monitoring Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-04-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |