ME LD782 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Quality of Life of Persons with Serious Illnesses
Title
An Act To Improve the Quality of Life of Persons with Serious Illnesses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #280 (Y: 132 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #268 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Enactment RC #148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #268 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Enactment RC #148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 280V 132 having voted in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-16 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | LD 782 In Senate, June 16, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 35 In Favor and 0 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 148 35 Yeas - 0 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-04 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-11 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |