ME LD77 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Require the Bureau of Parks and Lands to Maintain Public Restrooms at State Parks
Title
An Act to Require the Bureau of Parks and Lands to Maintain Public Restrooms at State Parks
Sponsors
Sen. James Libby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-02-06 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-02-01 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-01-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=77&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0049&item=1&snum=131 |