ME LD759 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Child Endangerment Laws To Include Certain Unauthorized Access to a Loaded Firearm

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Child Endangerment Laws To Include Certain Unauthorized Access to a Loaded Firearm

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - Senate - Adopt Sas-297 To Cah-292 RC #409 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #408 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #344 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #222 (Y: 77 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-17HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-17HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-292) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto.
2021-06-16SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2021-06-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-292) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-292) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto ADOPTED
2021-06-16SenateRoll Call Number 409 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-16SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-292) READ and ADOPTED Roll Call Ordered
2021-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-292) READ
2021-06-16SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-16SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 408 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-16SenateSubsequently, The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-292) Report ACCEPTED
2021-06-16SenateTaken from the table by the President
2021-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report was ACCEPTED
2021-06-15SenateRELEASED.
2021-06-14SenateHELD at the Request of Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin.
2021-06-14SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-14SenateSubsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2021-06-14SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 344 Yeas 15 - Nays 20 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2021-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
2021-06-14SenateTaken from the table by the President
2021-06-10SenateUnfinished Business
2021-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2021-06-10SenateReports READ
2021-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-10HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-292).
2021-06-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-10HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-292) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-10HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-10HouseROLL CALL NO. 222 (Yeas 77 - Nays 67 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2021-06-10HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-09HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-08HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-03HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-03HouseRepresentative WARREN of Hallowell moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-03HouseReports READ.
2021-06-01JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2021-05-06JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-05-06JointWork Session Held
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-10SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence
2021-03-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-03-10HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
2021-03-10HouseCommittee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=759&snum=130
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0564&item=1&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0564&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0564&item=4&snum=130
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN075902.pdf
Supplementhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN075904.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079229&chamber=House&serialnumber=222
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079229&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=344
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079229&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=408
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280079229&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=409

Bill Comments 750

feedback