ME LD736 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance the Ecological Reserve System
Title
An Act To Enhance the Ecological Reserve System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-771), in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-771) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-771). |
2022-02-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-01 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-29 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dill of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed. |