ME LD732 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Commissioner of Administrative and Financial Services To Sell or Lease the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Bangor, Orono and Thomaston
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Commissioner of Administrative and Financial Services To Sell or Lease the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Bangor, Orono and Thomaston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-214) thereto |
2015-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-214) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-214) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator WILLETTE of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-214) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-186), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator WILLETTE of Aroostook RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-186), in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-186). |
2015-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) . |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Willette of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-03-05 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |