ME LD713 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-14 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-14 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Further Protect Lake Water Quality
Title
Resolve, To Further Protect Lake Water Quality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin, REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=713&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0489&item=1&snum=127 |