ME LD711 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Certain Employees To Return to Participation in the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Title
An Act To Allow Certain Employees To Return to Participation in the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Rep. Danny Costain [R] |
Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Kevin O'Connell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) thereto. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) thereto ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) was READ. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-04-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) thereto |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-62) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-51) READ |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ Report Accepted |
2021-04-20 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-05 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-05 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-05 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |