ME LD692 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Eligibility of County Jail Inmates for a Community Confinement Monitoring Program
Title
An Act Regarding Eligibility of County Jail Inmates for a Community Confinement Monitoring Program
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Rebecca Jauch [D] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Ronald Russell [D] | Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-316), in concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-316) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-316). |
2023-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |