ME LD680 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reduce Waste from Disposable Bags
Title
An Act To Reduce Waste from Disposable Bags
Sponsors
Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Rep. Roberta Beavers [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Rep. Denise Harlow [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #41 (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-04-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 41 (Yeas 130 - Nays 15 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-04-28 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative FREDETTE of Newport. |
2015-04-28 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin, REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources, in concurrence. |
2015-03-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-03 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |