ME LD673 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-14 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Improve the Protection for Buyers of Motor Vehicles from Vehicles Labeled Lemons in Other States
Title
An Act To Improve the Protection for Buyers of Motor Vehicles from Vehicles Labeled Lemons in Other States
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Sen. Joseph Brannigan [D] | Rep. Steven Butterfield [D] | Rep. Richard Cleary [D] |
Sen. Christopher Rector [R] | Rep. Nancy Smith [D] | Rep. Thomas Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-31 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-03-31 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-03-26 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-02-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-24 | (S) On motion by Senator Schneider of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on BUSINESS, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Committee on Business, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |