ME LD648 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Expand the Types of Nonprofit Organizations to Which Surplus Property May Be Sold by the State
Title
An Act To Expand the Types of Nonprofit Organizations to Which Surplus Property May Be Sold by the State
Sponsors
Rep. Gay Grant [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] |
Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Roland Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #433 (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #446 (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #446 (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | Senate | in concurrence |
2017-08-02 | Senate | LD 648 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2017-08-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-08-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 446V 112 having voted in the affirmative and 25 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2017-08-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2017-05-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |