ME LD632 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Recognize and Provide for the Right of Members of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Hunt Moose throughout Aroostook County
Title
Resolve, To Recognize and Provide for the Right of Members of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians To Hunt Moose throughout Aroostook County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #250 (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 250 (Yeas 86 - Nays 58 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |