ME LD630 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Clarify That Food, Food Additives and Food Products Containing Hemp-derived Cannabidiol Produced and Sold within the State Are Not Adulterated and To Match the State's Definition of "Hemp" to the Definition in Federal Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Clarify That Food, Food Additives and Food Products Containing Hemp-derived Cannabidiol Produced and Sold within the State Are Not Adulterated and To Match the State's Definition of "Hemp" to the Definition in Federal Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-21HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-03-21SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2019-03-21SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-10), in concurrence.
2019-03-21SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-19SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-10) READ and ADOPTED
2019-03-19SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-19SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2019-03-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-10).
2019-03-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-03-14HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-02-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2019-02-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-05HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-02-05HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback