ME LD610 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding for Maine Public
Title
An Act To Provide Funding for Maine Public
Sponsors
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] | Rep. Jennifer DeChant [D] | Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] |
Rep. Christina Riley [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #180 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) in concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 180 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-401). |
2019-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-401) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-03 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Representative SAMPSON of Alfred WITHDREW her REQUEST for a Roll Call. |
2019-06-03 | House | Representative SAMPSON of Alfred REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED. |
2019-06-03 | House | Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |