ME LD606 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Provide Cost-based Reimbursement to Maine Veterans' Homes
Title
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Provide Cost-based Reimbursement to Maine Veterans' Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-120). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-120). |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-120) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |