ME LD577 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Access to Nutritious Foods in Schools by Implementing an After-school Food Program for At-risk Students
Title
An Act To Increase Access to Nutritious Foods in Schools by Implementing an After-school Food Program for At-risk Students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-226) in concurrence |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-226) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-226). |
2019-05-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-226) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |