ME LD576 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Adjust Appropriations and Allocations from the General Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of State Government Related to Position Changes for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016 and June 30, 2017
Title
An Act To Adjust Appropriations and Allocations from the General Fund and Other Funds for the Expenditures of State Government Related to Position Changes for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2015, June 30, 2016 and June 30, 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-02-26 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=576&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0400&item=1&snum=127 |