ME LD574 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Working Waterfront Covenants
Title
An Act to Amend the Laws Governing Working Waterfront Covenants
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] | Rep. Daniel Ankeles [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] |
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Rebecca Jauch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-34), in concurrence. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-34) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-04-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-34). |
2023-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence. |
2023-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |