ME LD559 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase the Number of Hours Certain Minor Students May Work Under Certain Circumstances
Title
An Act to Increase the Number of Hours Certain Minor Students May Work Under Certain Circumstances
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Costain [R] | Rep. Dean Cray [R] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Joshua Morris [R] |
Rep. Tracy Quint [R] | Rep. Heidi Sampson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #136 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #63 (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #63 (Y: 72 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 136 Yeas 21 - Nays 10 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 63 (Yeas 72 - Nays 67 - Absent 11 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-05-09 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |