ME LD525 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Failed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Industrial Hemp
Title
An Act To Promote Industrial Hemp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #236 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-406), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-406) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (24 -Yeas, 10 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Number 236 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-406). |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-406) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY, in concurrence. |
2013-02-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |