ME LD514 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Political Party Representation of Election Clerks
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Political Party Representation of Election Clerks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-93) in concurrence |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-93) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-93). |
2019-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-93) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |