ME LD512 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Number of Intensive Case Managers
Title
An Act To Increase the Number of Intensive Case Managers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-389), in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-389) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-389). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-07 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-17 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 17, 2021. |