ME LD51 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Eliminate the Bonding Authority of the Maine Governmental Facilities Authority
Title
An Act To Eliminate the Bonding Authority of the Maine Governmental Facilities Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative ROTUNDO of Lewiston, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford REFERRED to Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS , in concurrence. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-02-03 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-01-22 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-01-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2015-01-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-01-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-01-14 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=51&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0045&item=1&snum=127 |