ME LD509 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Transfer the Operation of the Fort Knox State Historic Site to the Friends of Fort Knox
Title
An Act To Transfer the Operation of the Fort Knox State Historic Site to the Friends of Fort Knox
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-05-27 | (S) On motion by Senator BRYANT of Oxford Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 110 (Yeas 83 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-26 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-18 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-13 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-12 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-05 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-15 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Representative PIEH of Bremen moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Nutting of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |