ME LD501 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Department of Administrative and Financial Services to Convey the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Machiasport
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Department of Administrative and Financial Services to Convey the Interests of the State in Certain Real Property Located in Machiasport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-04-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-16 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-02-16 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-02-16 | House | Representative PLUECKER from the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Reporting that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2023-02-15 | Joint | Reported Out: REF TO SLG |
2023-02-13 | Joint | Voted: REFERRED |
2023-02-13 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2023-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=501&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0316&item=1&snum=131 |