ME LD490 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Give the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife the Authority To Extend Any Trapping Season Based on Weather Conditions or Other Factors
Title
An Act To Give the Commissioner of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife the Authority To Extend Any Trapping Season Based on Weather Conditions or Other Factors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-03-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-9). |
2019-03-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-03-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-9) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-03-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2019-01-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |