ME LD470 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Traffic Safety Education in Schools
Title
An Act To Provide Traffic Safety Education in Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) in concurrence |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-04-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-83). |
2019-04-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-83) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-16 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-16 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-04-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2019-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |