ME LD44 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Lower the Age Requirement To Carry a Concealed Handgun
Title
An Act To Lower the Age Requirement To Carry a Concealed Handgun
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-01-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2017-01-10 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=44&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0024&item=1&snum=128 |