ME LD408 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Develop a Plan for Neurobehavioral Beds
Title
Resolve, To Require the Department of Health and Human Services To Develop a Plan for Neurobehavioral Beds
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] |
Rep. Andrew Gattine [D] | Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-471), in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (H-471) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-471). |
2019-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Resolve and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Health and Human Services in concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York the Resolve and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-05-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-21 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-05-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Representative HYMANSON of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-01-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-29 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |